THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:49:48 PM
Wilberforce, Kevin Charles
CPSO#:
54760
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay ON P7E 3W2
Phone: (807) 577-3540
Fax: (807) 577-3675
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES WILBERFORCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILBERFORCE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 06 Jun 1984 to 31 Jul 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1985 |