THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:24:30 PM
Kumar, Vijay
CPSO#:
54747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 674-1499
Fax: (705) 671-3649
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Vijay Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIJAY KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1984 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2023 |