THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:45:07 AM
Cohen, Eric Alan
CPSO#:
54737
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite D-375
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5880
Fax: (416) 480-5827
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC ALAN COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1984 |