THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:10:29 PM
Bennett, John Douglas
CPSO#:
54732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
279 Wharncliffe Road
London ON N6H 2C2
Phone: (519) 661-0275
Fax: (519) 661-0616
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site |
Penetanguishene |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 26, 2020, Dr. Bennett completed all components of this SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 26, 2020, Dr. Bennett completed all components of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)