THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:08:41 PM
Coire, Claire Isabelle
CPSO#:
54720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7297
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:09 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:11 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAIRE ISABELLE COIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COIRE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1988 |