THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:03:17 AM
Webb, Stephen Paul
CPSO#:
54695
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: (905) 573-4802
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stephen Webb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1988 |