THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:52:15 PM
Holmes, Alan Ross
CPSO#:
54680
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Apr 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
423 Colborne St East
Brantford ON N3S 3N5
Phone: 519 756 1741
Fax: 519 756 2017
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who saw Dr. Holmes from 2010-2014 should send medical record requests to 40 Shellington Place. Patients who saw Dr, Holmes from 2014-2016 should write to 130 Wilson Street
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON N3S 0C5,
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON L8R 1E2
Date Received: 25 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN ROSS HOLMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2021 |