THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:19:47 PM
Bennett, Susan
CPSO#:
54677
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Director Social Pediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 738-3626
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
CF - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 1988 to 15 Feb 1989
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2008 |