THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:22:44 PM
Ali, Abdulhafid Omar
CPSO#:
54666
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201 East Tower
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 404-9055
Fax: (905) 448-9988
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Abdulhafid Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULHAFID OMAR ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 13 Apr 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)