THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:52:02 AM
Kelly, Edmond Norman Mary
CPSO#:
54655
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Room 19-231C
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5310
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 19 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDMOND NORMAN MARY KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1986 |