THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:06:11 PM
French, Gordon John
CPSO#:
54648
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: G.J. French Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital
Medical Records Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, Ontario
K1H 8L6
Date Received: 02 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:12 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |