THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:12:25 AM
Metcalfe, Ian Leroy
CPSO#:
54621
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Steel City Medical
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Phone: (905) 545-1376
Fax: (905) 545-6793
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN LEROY METCALFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METCALFE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1985 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 04 Nov 2007 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jun 2007
Summary:
On June 18, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Metcalfe to have committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1 The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Metcalfe(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. Metcalfe successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Ethics Course and provides proof thereof to the College, to be completed by December 31, 2007.
2 The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Metcalfe to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00.
3. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Metcalfe to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 18, 2007