THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:20:04 AM
Cusimano, Robert James
CPSO#:
54600
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Calgary, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N 468
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4928
Fax: (416) 340-5069
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1984 |