THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:05:00 AM
Vijayaratnam, Visvalingam
CPSO#:
54599
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Sri Lanka, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne Street
Unit 711
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 929-0929
Fax: (416) 929-8084
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:28 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VISVALINGAM VIJAYARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAYARATNAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1996 |