THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:55:31 PM
Sinclair, Douglas Earle
CPSO#:
54576
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9700
IWK Health Centre
5850/5980 University Ave
G2039
Halifax NS B3K 5N0
Phone: 902 2332891
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 12 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS EARLE SINCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Nov 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2009 |