THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:39:26 AM
Young, Lionel Trevor
CPSO#:
54575
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 9467810
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIONEL TREVOR YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |