THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:37:54 AM
Mackenzie, Alexander Euan
CPSO#:
54572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2772
Fax: 613 738 4833
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A.E. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2010
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER EUAN MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1988 |