THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:42:09 PM
Williams, Anne Elizabeth
CPSO#:
54570
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Terrace On The Square
Suite 204 Level Two
8 -10 Rowan Street
St John's NL A1B 2X3
Phone: (709) 738-8883
Fax: (709) 738-8898
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:30 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1988 |