THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:50:48 PM
Wesley-James, Timothy
CPSO#:
54563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Urology Associates
89 Dawson Rd.
Suite 115
Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 824-7272
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:17 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY WESLEY-JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY-JAMES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1988 |