THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:08:33 PM
Gajdowski, Richard Jan
CPSO#:
54511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 997-3333
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD JAN GAJDOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAJDOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2003 |