THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:09:19 PM
Soliman, Gamal Mikhail Labib
CPSO#:
54506
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 May 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON L2R 0B2
Phone: (905) 346-0170
Fax: (905) 346-0338
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:03 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAMAL MIKHAIL LABIB SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1992 |