THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:03:51 PM
Moss, Judy Maureen
CPSO#:
54482
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Moss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients last date seen 2012 or earlier may contact Dr. Judy M. Moss at [email protected]
Orleans Family Health Clinic: 101-210 Centrum Blvd, Orleans, ON K1E 3V7
Fax: (613) 837-3781 Tel: (613) 837-5454
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients last date seen 2012 or earlier may contact Dr. Judy M. Moss at: [email protected]
Orleans Family Health Clinic: 101-210 Centrum Blvd, Orleans, ON K1E 3V7
Fax: (613) 837-3781 Tel: (613) 837-5454
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |