THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:19:12 AM
Cohen, Susan Barbara
CPSO#:
54475
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Metro Children's Aid
20 DeBoers
Unit 250
Toronto ON M3J 0H1
Phone: (416) 924-4640 Ext. 3415
Fax: (416) 324-2371
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN BARBARA COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Research Fellows - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1985 |