THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:13:40 PM
Jawahir, George Amarnauth
CPSO#:
54462
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Apr 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. George Jawahir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Arbour Medical
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON N1G 5J5
attn Office Manager
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1992 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 26 Apr 1996
Summary:
The Fitness to Practise Committee finds that Dr. Jawahir is an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to subsection 69(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code and it is desirable in the public interest that Dr. Jawahir(s practice be restricted. The Fitness to Practise Committee, on April 28, 1998, ordered that the Order of the Committee dated April 26, 1996, be replaced with certain of terms and conditions
On April 6, 2000, the Fitness to Practise Committee heard a motion to vacate the order of the Fitness to Practise Committee, dated September 30, 1998, and replace it with an acknowledgement and undertaking executed by Dr. Jawahir. The Committee ordered that the Fitness to Practise Committee(s orderer dated September 30, 1998 be vacated upon the execution of the Acknowledgement and Undertaking and Consent.
Appeal: No Appeal