THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:01:32 AM
Taylor, Charlene
CPSO#:
54458
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Taylor, Heather Charlene (used until: 26 Jun 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Charlene Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Community for Addiction and Mental Health Services
101 Nanticoke Creek Pkwy
Townsend, ON N0A 1S0
Date Received: 18 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |