THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:46:13 AM
Stinson, Jan Michelle
CPSO#:
54444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-66 West Avenue
St. Thomas ON N5R 5H7
Phone: 778-653-2427
Fax: 877-735-0289
Electoral District: 00
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.M. Stinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAN MICHELLE STINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1985 |