THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:59:56 AM
Moran, Patrick Bruce
CPSO#:
54427
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4125
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICK BRUCE MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1986 |