THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:23:41 AM
Baker, Kevin Robert
CPSO#:
54419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Feb 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
Phone: 613 686 1911
Fax: 613 830 1901
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:25 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 1988 |