THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:35:35 PM
Dillon, Michael James
CPSO#:
54383
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
324 Goldstream Ave
Westshore Community Health Centre P
Colwood BC V9B 2W3
Phone: 250.478.8357
Fax: 250.478.3699
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J. Dillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
New Zealand
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES DILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILLON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Aug 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1990 |