THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:55:37 PM
Jaychuk, Gregory Alexander
CPSO#:
54381
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Family Health Team
1261 Beaverbrook Drive.
London ON N6H0G6
Phone: 519-601-1036
Fax: 226-663-7984
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gregory A. Jaychuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY ALEXANDER JAYCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYCHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1985 |