THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:50:56 AM
Burnett, Judith Caroline Struan
CPSO#:
54379
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tough, Judith Caroline Struan (used until: 15 Apr 1996 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: 519 824 1010 Ext. 32168
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDITH CAROLINE STRUAN BURNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 1988 |