THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:20:09 AM
McLean, Jennifer Lynn
CPSO#:
54360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
779 Base Line Rd E
Thames Valley Children's Centre
London ON N6C 5Y6
Phone: 519-685-8700
Fax: 519-685-8689
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:28 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2011 |