THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:25:36 AM
Waring, Steven Rae
CPSO#:
54357
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2509 Canterbury Drive
Hays KS 67601
United States
Phone: 785-623-5095
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Waring Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kansas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN RAE WARING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARING is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1986 |