THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:14:01 PM
Hevenor, Robert Donald
CPSO#:
54321
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R.D. Hevenor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 20, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Hevenor was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his care of patients with chronic pain and his prescribing of opioids, benzodiazepines and other controlled drugs. In the fact of these allegations, Dr. Hevenor resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.