THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:12:58 AM
Justinich, Christopher James
CPSO#:
54304
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Dec 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.J. Justinich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patient Records can be obtained at the following locations:
Kingston General Hospital/Hotel Dieu Hospital
76 Stewart Street
Kingston ON K2L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666
Perth Smith Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: 613-267-1500
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5645
Belleville General Hospital
265 East Dundas Street
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 613-969-7400
Date Received: 26 Jul 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:16 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Aug 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |