THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:35:25 AM
Nguyen, Tuyet Thi
CPSO#:
54300
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
906 Kingsway
Kids Clinic
Vancouver BC V5V 3C4
Phone: 604-370-4101
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Florian Braig and Dr. Tuyet Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Canada
111 St Regis Crest South
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 01 Jan 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TUYET THI NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2010 |