THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:05:19 AM
Graham, Duncan Claire Macrae
CPSO#:
54291
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Duncan Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
or
Call toll free at: 1-800-775-0093 or visit www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 Aug 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2020 |