THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:49:34 AM
Martin, Claudio Marcelo
CPSO#:
54280
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Claudio Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre,
Health Records
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON
Date Received: 28 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2022 |