THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:27:03 AM
Engel, Cecil Jay
CPSO#:
54252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
Department of Surgical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6651
Fax: (613) 546-8221
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CECIL JAY ENGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1985 |