THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:43:55 AM
Kobayashi, Kenneth Alan
CPSO#:
54245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth A. Kobayashi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener, Ontario
N2G 1G3
Date Received: 16 Feb 2010
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Suite 305
99 Northfield Drive East
Waterloo, Ontario
N2K 3P9
Date Received: 25 Nov 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:12 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN KOBAYASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBAYASHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1985 |