THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:12:40 PM
Bain, James Ralph
CPSO#:
54242
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E16
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73222
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES RALPH BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1985 |