THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:35:58 PM
Smythe, Donna Elizabeth
CPSO#:
54234
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON M8X 2W2
Phone: (416) 231-5200
Fax: (416) 231-8369
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:13 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONNA ELIZABETH SMYTHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1986 |