THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:38:37 AM
Campbell, Fiona Anne
CPSO#:
54230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 May 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7451
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 May 2003 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Sep 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
|
Active |