THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:13:34 PM
Shorter, Anne Marie
CPSO#:
54225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chalmers Gate X-Ray and U/S
#309
328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 731-4001
Fax: (905) 731-1458
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Anne Marie Shorter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE SHORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1985 |