THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:06:45 PM
Redelmeier, Donald Andrew
CPSO#:
54221
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G- 151
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6999
Fax: (416) 480-6048
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD ANDREW REDELMEIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDELMEIER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1985 |