THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:40:52 PM
Buller, Christopher Edmund Howard
CPSO#:
54208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5P 1A5
Phone: 289-937-1134
Fax: (416) 864-5478
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDMUND HOWARD BULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Aug 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2009 |