THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:09:58 AM
Fox, Joanne Marie
CPSO#:
54205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Homonylo, Joanne Marie (used until: 10 May 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
540 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON L6K 3P1
Phone: (905) 845-1544
Fax: (905) 845-2024
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNE MARIE FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2004 |