THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:45:21 AM
Crosby, Edward Thomas
CPSO#:
54204
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 May 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2024 |