THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:17:10 PM
Mackintosh, Deirdre Mary
CPSO#:
54182
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Nov 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tighe, Deirdre Mary (used until: 17 Jun 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Nov 1986
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |