THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:36:07 PM
Delpero, Walter
CPSO#:
54170
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 728-0247
Fax: (613) 728-7685
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:11 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WALTER DELPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELPERO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1985 |